Jan Erik Klepsland
Chief Executive Officer chez ST ENERGY TRANSITION I LTD.
Profil
Jan Erik Klepsland is currently the Director at NorAm Drilling AS, Archer Ltd., Archer Norge AS, Seatankers Management Norway AS, Northern Ocean Ltd., Fortis Operations AS, and the Chief Executive & Financial Officer at ST Energy Transition I Ltd.
He previously worked as a Director at Nordea Markets (Norway) and Partner at ABG Sundal Collier Holding ASA. Mr. Klepsland holds a graduate degree from the Norwegian School of Economics & Business Administration.
Postes actifs de Jan Erik Klepsland
Sociétés | Poste | Début |
---|---|---|
ST ENERGY TRANSITION I LTD. | Chief Executive Officer | 03/02/2023 |
ARCHER LIMITED | Director/Board Member | 01/10/2021 |
NORAM DRILLING | Director/Board Member | 01/06/2023 |
NORTHERN OCEAN LTD. | Director/Board Member | - |
Seatankers Management Norway AS
Seatankers Management Norway AS Investment ManagersFinance Seatankers Management Norway AS operates in the employment services industry. The private company is based in Oslo, Norway. The CEO of the Norwegian company is Lars Erich Nilsen. | Chief Investment Officer | - |
Archer Norge AS
Archer Norge AS Contract DrillingIndustrial Services Part of Archer Ltd., Archer Norge AS is a market leading offshore drilling and p&a contractor specializing in fixed installations and supporting modular and mobile operations. The private company is based in Sandnes, Norway. The Norwegian company's portfolio includes 44 platform rigs, 3 semi-submersibles, 2 modular rigs, and 1 modu tender barge. Archer's corporate governance ensures compliance with all relevant laws and regulations, and they aim to create competitive returns for shareholders through operating with the highest ethical requirements. The company was founded in 2007, and the CEO is Dag Skindlo. | Director/Board Member | 01/10/2021 |
Anciens postes connus de Jan Erik Klepsland
Sociétés | Poste | Fin |
---|---|---|
ABG SUNDAL COLLIER HOLDING ASA | Corporate Officer/Principal | 01/09/2020 |
Nordea Markets (Norway) | Director/Board Member | - |
Formation de Jan Erik Klepsland
Norwegian School of Economics & Business Administration | Graduate Degree |
Expériences
Fonctions occupées
Relations
Relations au 1er degré
Entreprises liées au 1er degré
Homme
Femme
Administrateurs
Exécutifs
Sociétés liées
Sociétés cotées | 4 |
---|---|
ABG SUNDAL COLLIER HOLDING ASA | Finance |
NORAM DRILLING | Industrial Services |
ARCHER LIMITED | Industrial Services |
NORTHERN OCEAN LTD. | Industrial Services |
Entreprise privées | 4 |
---|---|
Archer Norge AS
Archer Norge AS Contract DrillingIndustrial Services Part of Archer Ltd., Archer Norge AS is a market leading offshore drilling and p&a contractor specializing in fixed installations and supporting modular and mobile operations. The private company is based in Sandnes, Norway. The Norwegian company's portfolio includes 44 platform rigs, 3 semi-submersibles, 2 modular rigs, and 1 modu tender barge. Archer's corporate governance ensures compliance with all relevant laws and regulations, and they aim to create competitive returns for shareholders through operating with the highest ethical requirements. The company was founded in 2007, and the CEO is Dag Skindlo. | Industrial Services |
Seatankers Management Norway AS
Seatankers Management Norway AS Investment ManagersFinance Seatankers Management Norway AS operates in the employment services industry. The private company is based in Oslo, Norway. The CEO of the Norwegian company is Lars Erich Nilsen. | Finance |
Nordea Markets (Norway) | |
ST Energy Transition I Ltd.
ST Energy Transition I Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance ST Energy Transition I Ltd. is a blank check company, which was formed for the purpose of effecting a merger, share exchange, asset acquisition, share purchase, reorganization or similar business combination with one or more businesses. The company was founded on April 9, 2021 and is headquartered in Hamilton, Bermuda. | Finance |