Laila Halvorsen
Director of Finance/CFO chez DHT HOLDINGS, INC.
Fortune : 2 M $ au 31/03/2024
Profil
Ms. Laila C.
Halvorsen is a Chief Financial Officer at DHT Holdings, Inc. Ms. Halvorsen was previously employed as a Group Accounting Manager by Western Bulk ASA.
Détentions connues dans des sociétés publiques
Société | Date | Nombre d'actions | Valorisation | Date de valorisation |
---|---|---|---|---|
DHT HOLDINGS, INC.
0,12% | 15/03/2024 | 185 309 ( 0,12% ) | 2 M $ | 31/03/2024 |
Postes actifs de Laila Halvorsen
Sociétés | Poste | Début |
---|---|---|
DHT HOLDINGS, INC. | Director of Finance/CFO | 11/06/2018 |
Anciens postes connus de Laila Halvorsen
Sociétés | Poste | Fin |
---|---|---|
BULK INVEST ASA | Comptroller/Controller/Auditor | 01/09/2014 |
Expériences
Fonctions occupées
Relations
Relations au 1er degré
Entreprises liées au 1er degré
Homme
Femme
Administrateurs
Exécutifs
Sociétés liées
Sociétés cotées | 1 |
---|---|
DHT HOLDINGS, INC. | Transportation |
Entreprise privées | 1 |
---|---|
Bulk Invest ASA
Bulk Invest ASA Marine ShippingTransportation Bulk Invest ASA provides shipping services. It owns, rents, and operates ships and chartering activities. The company was founded on May 5, 1999 and is headquartered in Oslo, Norway. | Transportation |