Pardeep S. Sangha
Directeur/Membre du Conseil chez ROSHNI CAPITAL INC.
Postes actifs de Pardeep S. Sangha
Sociétés | Poste | Début | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
WELL HEALTH TECHNOLOGIES CORP. | Investor Relations Contact | - | - |
WISHPOND TECHNOLOGIES LTD. | Investor Relations Contact | - | - |
ROSHNI CAPITAL INC. | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | 12/05/2021 | - |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 12/05/2021 | - | |
INEO TECH CORP. | Investor Relations Contact | - | - |
Angad Capital, Inc. | Fondateur | 01/04/2019 | - |
President | 01/04/2019 | - |
Historique de carrière de Pardeep S. Sangha
Anciens postes connus de Pardeep S. Sangha
Sociétés | Poste | Début | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
ALPHA COGNITION INC. | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | 03/07/2019 | 01/03/2021 |
Haywood Securities, Inc.
Haywood Securities, Inc. Investment Banks/BrokersFinance Founded in 1981, Haywood Securities Inc. is a broker/dealer headquartered in Vancouver, British Columbia with additional offices in Calgary and Toronto. The firm offers a full array of investment services. Their research focuses on companies in the mining, oil & gas, biotechnology, telecommunications and technology sectors. They focus on young companies that are built around innovative ideas and offer the potential for rapid growth. Haywood Securities is a member of the Toronto Stock Exchange, the TSX Venture Exchange, the Montreal Exchange, the Canadian Trading and Quotation System, the Canadian Investor Protection Fund and the Investment Dealers Association of Canada. They are also registered to transact securities business in the U.S. and are a member of the NASD. | Analyst-Equity | 01/10/2015 | 01/04/2019 |
PI Financial Corp.
PI Financial Corp. Investment Banks/BrokersFinance Ventum Financial Corp. is a full-service Investment Dealer headquartered in Vancouver, Canada. The firm was founded by Max Meier and John Eymann in 1982 as Pacific International Securities, Inc. They became PI Financial Corp. (PI) in 2007 and changed their name to Ventum Financial Corp. in 2024 as part of the process of amalgamation between PI and Echelon Wealth Partners, Inc., previously announced in March 2023. Ventum Financial provides expertise across a variety of growth sectors and delivers a full range of capital markets services, which include equity research, investment banking, advisory, and institutional sales and trading to mid-market corporate clients in Canada. They prioritize minimal market impact during superior trade execution. | Analyst-Equity | 01/09/2007 | 31/08/2015 |
ANTERA VENTURES II CORP. | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | 01/01/2021 | - |
░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ | - | - |
Formation de Pardeep S. Sangha
University of British Columbia | Masters Business Admin |
Statistiques
Internationale
Canada | 11 |
Royaume-Uni | 2 |
Opérationnelle
Investor Relations Contact | 3 |
Director/Board Member | 3 |
Analyst-Equity | 2 |
Sectorielle
Finance | 6 |
Consumer Services | 2 |
Communications | 2 |
Fonctions occupées
Actives
Inactives
Sociétés cotées
Entreprise privées
Sociétés liées
Sociétés cotées | 6 |
---|---|
TELUS CORPORATION | Communications |
WELL HEALTH TECHNOLOGIES CORP. | Health Services |
WISHPOND TECHNOLOGIES LTD. | Technology Services |
ANTERA VENTURES II CORP. | Finance |
ROSHNI CAPITAL INC. | Finance |
INEO TECH CORP. | Commercial Services |
Entreprise privées | 4 |
---|---|
PI Financial Corp.
PI Financial Corp. Investment Banks/BrokersFinance Ventum Financial Corp. is a full-service Investment Dealer headquartered in Vancouver, Canada. The firm was founded by Max Meier and John Eymann in 1982 as Pacific International Securities, Inc. They became PI Financial Corp. (PI) in 2007 and changed their name to Ventum Financial Corp. in 2024 as part of the process of amalgamation between PI and Echelon Wealth Partners, Inc., previously announced in March 2023. Ventum Financial provides expertise across a variety of growth sectors and delivers a full range of capital markets services, which include equity research, investment banking, advisory, and institutional sales and trading to mid-market corporate clients in Canada. They prioritize minimal market impact during superior trade execution. | Finance |
Haywood Securities, Inc.
Haywood Securities, Inc. Investment Banks/BrokersFinance Founded in 1981, Haywood Securities Inc. is a broker/dealer headquartered in Vancouver, British Columbia with additional offices in Calgary and Toronto. The firm offers a full array of investment services. Their research focuses on companies in the mining, oil & gas, biotechnology, telecommunications and technology sectors. They focus on young companies that are built around innovative ideas and offer the potential for rapid growth. Haywood Securities is a member of the Toronto Stock Exchange, the TSX Venture Exchange, the Montreal Exchange, the Canadian Trading and Quotation System, the Canadian Investor Protection Fund and the Investment Dealers Association of Canada. They are also registered to transact securities business in the U.S. and are a member of the NASD. | Finance |
Crystal Bridge Enterprises, Inc.
Crystal Bridge Enterprises, Inc. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Crystal Bridge Enterprises Inc. engages as a capital pool company. It intends to manage capital to safeguard its accumulated capital by maintaining a sufficient level of funds to complete the company’s QT while providing adequate returns to shareholders. Crystal Bridge Enterprises was founded on November 15, 2017 and is headquartered in Vancouver, Canada. | Finance |
Angad Capital, Inc. |
- Bourse
- Insiders
- Pardeep S. Sangha
- Expérience