Finbarr O'Neill
Président chez APCO Holdings, Inc.
Profil
Finbarr J.
O'Neill is currently the Chairman at APCO Holdings, Inc. and the Executive Chairman at APCO Holdings LLC.
Previously, he served as the President & Chief Executive Officer at The Reynolds & Reynolds Co. from 2005 to 2007, and as the President & Chief Executive Officer at J.D.
Power from 2008 to 2018.
He also held the position of President & Chief Executive Officer at Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Mr. O'Neill obtained his undergraduate degree from The Trustees of Columbia University in The City of New York and his graduate degree from Fordham University.
Postes actifs de Finbarr O'Neill
Sociétés | Poste | Début |
---|---|---|
APCO Holdings, Inc.
APCO Holdings, Inc. MiscellaneousMiscellaneous APCO Holdings, Inc. engages in the marketing and administering of vehicle service contracts. It markets its products using the EasyCare and GWC brands, as well as other private label automobile manufacturer brands, through a network of independent agents and an internal salesforce that specialize in consulting with and servicing the automotive dealership markets. The company was founded by Larry I. Dorfman in 1984 and is headquartered in Norcross, GA. | Président | 16/05/2019 |
APCO Holdings LLC
APCO Holdings LLC Finance/Rental/LeasingFinance APCO Holdings LLC provides automotive finance and insurance services. The private company is based in Norcross, GA and has subsidiaries in the United States. The company was founded in 1984. Tony Wanderon has been the CEO of the company since 2023. | Président | 01/05/2019 |
Anciens postes connus de Finbarr O'Neill
Sociétés | Poste | Fin |
---|---|---|
J.D. Power
J.D. Power Data Processing ServicesTechnology Services J.D. Power provides marketing information, customer surveys and consulting services. Its services include industry-wide syndicated studies, proprietary tracking studies, media studies, forecasting and training services, business operations analyses and consulting. The company was founded by James David Power, III in 1968 and is headquartered in Costa Mesa, CA. | Directeur Général | 21/03/2018 |
The Reynolds & Reynolds Co.
The Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Packaged SoftwareTechnology Services The Reynolds & Reynolds Co. develops and supports software for automotive retailers. It offers accounting and HR, dealer, parts, and dealership services. The company was founded by Lucius D. Reynolds and James R. Gardner in 1866 and is headquartered in Dayton, OH. | Directeur Général | 26/10/2007 |
Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Motor VehiclesConsumer Durables Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. manufactures and sells Mitsubishi brand cars and sport utility vehicles through a network of almost 700 dealers in the US, Canada, Mexico and the Caribbean. Its other models include the Raider pickup, Outlander SUV and Lancer sedan. The company was founded in October, 1985 and is headquartered in Cypress, CA. | President | - |
Formation de Finbarr O'Neill
Fordham University | Graduate Degree |
The Trustees of Columbia University in The City of New York | Undergraduate Degree |
Expériences
Fonctions occupées
Relations
Relations au 1er degré
Entreprises liées au 1er degré
Homme
Femme
Administrateurs
Exécutifs
Sociétés liées
Entreprise privées | 5 |
---|---|
The Reynolds & Reynolds Co.
The Reynolds & Reynolds Co. Packaged SoftwareTechnology Services The Reynolds & Reynolds Co. develops and supports software for automotive retailers. It offers accounting and HR, dealer, parts, and dealership services. The company was founded by Lucius D. Reynolds and James R. Gardner in 1866 and is headquartered in Dayton, OH. | Technology Services |
Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Motor VehiclesConsumer Durables Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. manufactures and sells Mitsubishi brand cars and sport utility vehicles through a network of almost 700 dealers in the US, Canada, Mexico and the Caribbean. Its other models include the Raider pickup, Outlander SUV and Lancer sedan. The company was founded in October, 1985 and is headquartered in Cypress, CA. | Consumer Durables |
J.D. Power
J.D. Power Data Processing ServicesTechnology Services J.D. Power provides marketing information, customer surveys and consulting services. Its services include industry-wide syndicated studies, proprietary tracking studies, media studies, forecasting and training services, business operations analyses and consulting. The company was founded by James David Power, III in 1968 and is headquartered in Costa Mesa, CA. | Technology Services |
APCO Holdings, Inc.
APCO Holdings, Inc. MiscellaneousMiscellaneous APCO Holdings, Inc. engages in the marketing and administering of vehicle service contracts. It markets its products using the EasyCare and GWC brands, as well as other private label automobile manufacturer brands, through a network of independent agents and an internal salesforce that specialize in consulting with and servicing the automotive dealership markets. The company was founded by Larry I. Dorfman in 1984 and is headquartered in Norcross, GA. | Miscellaneous |
APCO Holdings LLC
APCO Holdings LLC Finance/Rental/LeasingFinance APCO Holdings LLC provides automotive finance and insurance services. The private company is based in Norcross, GA and has subsidiaries in the United States. The company was founded in 1984. Tony Wanderon has been the CEO of the company since 2023. | Finance |