Donald McLay
Président chez RLF AGTECH LTD
Fortune : 3 M $ au 30/04/2024
Postes actifs de Donald McLay
Sociétés | Poste | Début | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
RLF AGTECH LTD | Président | 01/08/2021 | - |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 01/08/2021 | - | |
Torres Industries Pty Ltd.
Torres Industries Pty Ltd. MiscellaneousMiscellaneous Torres Industries Pty Ltd. is an Australian investment company. The private company is based in Springg Hill, Australia. | Président | 30/12/2010 | - |
Financial Services Institute of Australasia | Corporate Officer/Principal | - | - |
Clime Pvt Ltd.
Clime Pvt Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Clime Pvt Ltd. is a private company headquartered in Sydney, Australia. The firm provides investment services. | Président | - | - |
Governance Institute of Australia Ltd.
Governance Institute of Australia Ltd. Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Governance Institute of Australia Ltd. provides education, support, and networking opportunities for directors, Australian company secretaries, governance advisers, and risk managers. The private company is based in Sydney, Australia. Megan Motto has been the CEO of the company since 2019. | Corporate Officer/Principal | - | - |
Institute of Chartered Accountants of New Zealand | Président | - | - |
Fondateur | - | - |
Historique de carrière de Donald McLay
Anciens postes connus de Donald McLay
Sociétés | Poste | Début | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
CREDIT CORP GROUP LIMITED | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | 04/02/2021 | 18/11/2021 |
Président | 30/06/2008 | 04/02/2021 | |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 31/03/2008 | 18/11/2021 | |
REGISTRY DIRECT LIMITED | Président | 30/05/2018 | 13/10/2020 |
CLIME INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LIMITED | Président | 01/03/2015 | 01/10/2020 |
░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - | - |
Formation de Donald McLay
University of Otago | Undergraduate Degree |
Statistiques
Internationale
Australie | 10 |
Nouvelle-Zélande | 3 |
Opérationnelle
Chairman | 7 |
Director/Board Member | 2 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 2 |
Sectorielle
Finance | 4 |
Commercial Services | 3 |
Consumer Services | 3 |
Fonctions occupées
Actives
Inactives
Sociétés cotées
Entreprise privées
Sociétés liées
Sociétés cotées | 3 |
---|---|
CREDIT CORP GROUP LIMITED | Commercial Services |
CLIME INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LIMITED | Finance |
RLF AGTECH LTD | Process Industries |
Entreprise privées | 6 |
---|---|
Torres Industries Pty Ltd.
Torres Industries Pty Ltd. MiscellaneousMiscellaneous Torres Industries Pty Ltd. is an Australian investment company. The private company is based in Springg Hill, Australia. | Miscellaneous |
GMO Australia Ltd.
GMO Australia Ltd. Investment ManagersFinance GMO Australia Ltd. is the Australian investment management subsidiary of US-based Grantham, Mayo, Van Otterloo Co. LLC. Headquartered in Sydney, the firm was founded in 1995 and provides asset management services for wholesale clients including superannuation funds, public sector funds, charities and other financial institutions. | Finance |
Registry Direct Ltd.
Registry Direct Ltd. Packaged SoftwareTechnology Services Registry Direct Ltd. engages in the provision of share registry services to listed and unlisted companies, fund managers and product issuers. It develops a cost-effective platform, designed for business administrators and advisers. The company was founded by Steuart Roe in 2012 and is headquartered in Melbourne, Australia. | Technology Services |
Clime Pvt Ltd.
Clime Pvt Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Clime Pvt Ltd. is a private company headquartered in Sydney, Australia. The firm provides investment services. | Finance |
Governance Institute of Australia Ltd.
Governance Institute of Australia Ltd. Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Governance Institute of Australia Ltd. provides education, support, and networking opportunities for directors, Australian company secretaries, governance advisers, and risk managers. The private company is based in Sydney, Australia. Megan Motto has been the CEO of the company since 2019. | Commercial Services |
Institute of Chartered Accountants of New Zealand |
- Bourse
- Insiders
- Donald McLay
- Expérience